This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2020 at 20:50:48 (UTC).

LOCKETT, TRANESHIA DENE VS MOODY, TRENT LENARD

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 LOCKETT, TRANESHIA DENE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MOODY, TRENT LENARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0095

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOCKETT TRANESHIA DENE

Respondent

MOODY TRENT LENARD

 

Court Documents

Declaration - UCCJEA

2/13/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Summons

2/13/2020: Summons

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

2/13/2020: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Declaration - Income and Expense

2/13/2020: Declaration - Income and Expense

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/13/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

2/13/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

2/13/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Declaration - Separate Property

2/13/2020: Declaration - Separate Property

Proof of Service of Summons

2/20/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.