This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2022 at 06:43:58 (UTC).

LOCATION SERVICES HOLDINGS LLC VS PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 LOCATION SERVICES HOLDINGS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1065

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOCATION SERVICES HOLDINGS LLC

Defendants

PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY

QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GINSBURG DAVID R.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/22/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/22/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/22/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/22/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

10/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/28/2022: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/26/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/26/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1332, 1441, AND 1446

10/26/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1332, 1441, AND 1446

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • Hearing01/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketNotice OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1332, 1441, AND 1446; Filed by: PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION (Defendant); As to: LOCATION SERVICES HOLDINGS LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: LOCATION SERVICES HOLDINGS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION (Defendant); Service Date: 09/30/2022; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: LOCATION SERVICES HOLDINGS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); Service Date: 09/30/2022; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: LOCATION SERVICES HOLDINGS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); Service Date: 09/26/2022; Service Cost: 70.80; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: LOCATION SERVICES HOLDINGS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION (Defendant); Service Date: 09/29/2022; Service Cost: 136.55; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by: LOCATION SERVICES HOLDINGS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- David R. Ginsburg (Attorney): Name Suffix: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketAddress for David R. Ginsburg (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LOCATION SERVICES HOLDINGS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LOCATION SERVICES HOLDINGS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LOCATION SERVICES HOLDINGS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Holly J. Fujie in Department 56 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Insurance Company B is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Ryan Ginsburg