This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2022 at 22:32:16 (UTC).

LMG, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION VS THE STAGING DEPARTMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 LMG, INC , A FLORIDA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THE STAGING DEPARTMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0598

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LMG INC. A FLORIDA CORPORATION DBA LMG LLC & LMG TECHNICAL SERVICES DBA LMG INC.

Defendant

THE STAGING DEPARTMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA THE STAGING DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HETTENA ALEXANDER V

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/15/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/26/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • Hearing11/18/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by LMG, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LMG, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LMG, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LMG, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HETTENA ALEXANDER V