This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/08/2020 at 05:29:17 (UTC).

LLOYD SUN VS JOHN P STEELE

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 LLOYD SUN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN P STEELE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0086

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUN LLOYD

Defendant

STEELE JOHN P DBA JPS MOTORSPORTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAN FRANKY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING)

10/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING)

Declaration - DECLARATION RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

9/10/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARISSA E. BARELA RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

9/10/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARISSA E. BARELA RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/10/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT

9/19/2019: Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE SANCTIONS INCLUDING DISMISSAL)

7/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE SANCTIONS INCLUDING DISMISSAL)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARISSA E. BALERA, ESQ. RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

7/12/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARISSA E. BALERA, ESQ. RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Proof of Service by Mail

7/12/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL]

7/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL]

Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

7/15/2019: Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/17/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION DEFAULT/CLERK'S JUDGMENT]

7/17/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION DEFAULT/CLERK'S JUDGMENT]

Request for Dismissal

7/17/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/26/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/28/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/28/2019

6/28/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/28/2019

Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

4/25/2019: Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Default Prove Up Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Docketat 4:27 PM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Lloyd Sun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Lloyd Sun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Marissa E. Barela Re: Entry of Default Judgment); Filed by Lloyd Sun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Re: Entry of Default Judgment); Filed by Lloyd Sun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (re Sanctions including Dismissal) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re Sanctions including Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lloyd Sun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lloyd Sun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lloyd Sun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lloyd Sun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAN FRANKY