This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 12:58:50 (UTC).

LLOYD MOSLEY VS TILLY'S, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2021 LLOYD MOSLEY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against TILLY'S, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1335

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOSLEY LLOYD

Defendant

TILLY'S INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAGALLANES DAYTON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/10/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/10/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/10/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/9/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

1/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

1/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 01/19/2022

1/19/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 01/19/2022

Request for Dismissal

2/4/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Lloyd Mosley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 01/19/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lloyd Mosley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lloyd Mosley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lloyd Mosley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lloyd Mosley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TILLYS INC AKA is a litigant