This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 09:24:23 (UTC).

LLOYD MOSLEY VS BATH & BODY WORKS DIRECT, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 LLOYD MOSLEY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BATH BODY WORKS DIRECT, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2728

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOSLEY LLOYD

Defendant

BATH & BODY WORKS DIRECT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAGALLANES DAYTON

Defendant Attorney

CATIGNANI CORY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/13/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

7/27/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/17/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/18/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Lloyd Mosley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lloyd Mosley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Bath & Body Works Direct, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lloyd Mosley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lloyd Mosley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lloyd Mosley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BATH & BODY WORKS DIRECT, INC. is a litigant