This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2022 at 17:07:32 (UTC).

LLANDY B. MAZARIEGOS VS HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 LLANDY B MAZARIEGOS filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against HOME DEPOT U S A , INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0855

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAZARIEGOS LLANDY B.

Defendants

HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC.

NEGI DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOMEZ CARLOS ALBERTO

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/21/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/21/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/21/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/21/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/21/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/21/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2024
  • Hearing09/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2024
  • Hearing03/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2024
  • Hearing03/06/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Llandy B. Mazariegos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Llandy B. Mazariegos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Llandy B. Mazariegos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Llandy B. Mazariegos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOMEZ CARLOS ALBERTO