This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/22/2021 at 19:17:56 (UTC).

LJ MACHINING INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS ENVISIONTEC, INC., A MICHIGAN CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 LJ MACHINING INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ENVISIONTEC, INC , A MICHIGAN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6708

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LJ MACHINING INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

PHAM VU

ENVISIONTEC INC. A MICHIGAN CORPORATION

SHKOLNIK SASHA AKA ALEXANDR SHKOLNIK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NONG JULIE

Defendant Attorney

WHEELER BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SELECTION OF A MEDIATOR)

1/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SELECTION OF A MEDIATOR)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/5/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 11/06/2020

11/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 11/06/2020

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/22/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/22/2020: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

7/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/13/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer

7/17/2020: Answer

Answer

7/17/2020: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/13/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE CLERK'S ENTRY O...)

8/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE CLERK'S ENTRY O...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE CLERK'S ENTRY O...) OF 08/14/2020

8/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE CLERK'S ENTRY O...) OF 08/14/2020

Complaint

5/1/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/1/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/1/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/4/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • Hearing11/01/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • Hearing10/18/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Hearing06/23/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Status Conference (re Selection of a Mediator) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re Selection of a Mediator)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 11/06/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by ENVISIONTEC, INC., a Michigan corporation (Defendant); SASHA SHKOLNIK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by LJ MACHINING INC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ENVISIONTEC, INC., a Michigan corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SASHA SHKOLNIK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by LJ MACHINING INC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LJ MACHINING INC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LJ MACHINING INC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LJ MACHINING INC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LJ MACHINING INC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LJ MACHINING INC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less