This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2022 at 15:00:14 (UTC).

LIZARRAGA, JORDAN - MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 11/08/2022 LIZARRAGA, JORDAN - MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1206

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LIZARRAGA PATRICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BREITER BRIAN JAMES

 

Court Documents

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited)

11/8/2022: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • Hearing01/20/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketOrder - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BREITER BRIAN J.