This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2021 at 20:02:25 (UTC).

LIVING THE DREAM VS JOHN ANTHONY TOMICH

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 LIVING THE DREAM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOHN ANTHONY TOMICH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8060

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

LIVING THE DREAM

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

TOMICH JOHN ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

EDELSON ALISA S.

JABLON ANDREW

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

VEGLIA ALICIA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

10/20/2021: Answer

Answer

9/7/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

9/7/2021: Cross-Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 09/08/2021

9/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 09/08/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

9/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

9/8/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

9/8/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Proof of Personal Service

8/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/30/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

7/30/2021: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • Hearing01/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Living the Dream (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Living the Dream (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docketat 10:45 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docketat 2:48 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Peremptory Challenge) of 09/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Peremptory Challenge)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by John Anthony Tomich (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Living the Dream (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Living the Dream (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Living the Dream (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Living the Dream (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Living the Dream (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Living the Dream (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIVING THE DREAM INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VEGLIA ALICIA