Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2021 at 13:12:21 (UTC).

LIU, YUANTING VS FAN, QIWEN

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 LIU, YUANTING filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FAN, QIWEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3824

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LIU YUANTING

Respondent

FAN QIWEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JIANG HELEN BING

 

Court Documents

Judgment Package Received - FC2336

4/5/2021: Judgment Package Received - FC2336

Judgment Package Received - FC2336

11/16/2020: Judgment Package Received - FC2336

Judgment Package Received - FC2336

3/11/2021: Judgment Package Received - FC2336

Declaration - Default FL170

1/20/2021: Declaration - Default FL170

Notice - Rejection - Judgment package submitted 09/16/2020

11/3/2020: Notice - Rejection - Judgment package submitted 09/16/2020

Proof of Service of Summons

9/21/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons

9/28/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Request - Enter Default FL165

9/28/2020: Request - Enter Default FL165

Proof of Service of Summons

9/28/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rej.

8/28/2020: Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rej.

Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rej.

8/28/2020: Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rej.

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure - Deficient, marked as Respondent

6/24/2020: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure - Deficient, marked as Respondent

Proof of Service of Summons - DEFECTIVE

6/24/2020: Proof of Service of Summons - DEFECTIVE

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

4/29/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

4/29/2020: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

4/29/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Notice - Case Assignment

4/30/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

4/30/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNotice - Rejection (Judgment package submitted 09/16/2020 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (Rej. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (Deficient, marked as Respondent ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (DEFECTIVE ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JIANG HELEN BING