This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2020 at 09:50:20 (UTC).

LIU, NA VS SHANG, JACK YUNFEI

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 LIU, NA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SHANG, JACK YUNFEI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7196

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LIU NA

Respondent

SHANG JACK YUNFEI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketMail - Returned Mail (Request to Enter Default )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Personal ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liu (DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF, Chun is a litigant