Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 13:56:06 (UTC).

LIU, HONG VS ATOMRE, DELIA

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 LIU, HONG filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against ATOMRE, DELIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WEINGART, GREGORY J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0037

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WEINGART, GREGORY J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LIU HONG

Respondent

ATOMRE DELIA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/2/2021: Minute Order

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

2/2/2021: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Petition - Civil Harassment

1/12/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

1/12/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/12/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Proof of Service - CH-200

1/20/2021: Proof of Service - CH-200

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department B, Weingart, Gregory J, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO Before Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (CH-200 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less