This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2022 at 17:53:42 (UTC).

LISETT C. GONZALEZ, ET AL. VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC., A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 LISETT C GONZALEZ filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC , A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY J. FUJIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6311

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY J. FUJIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AGUSTIN-ARELLANO FERNANDO

GONZALEZ LISETT C.

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON KEVIN Y.

Defendant Attorney

VALENCIA JESSE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/18/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/17/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

5/17/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/17/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/17/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

6/16/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

6/22/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/22/2022

6/22/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/22/2022

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/16/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • Hearing10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • Docketat 2:15 PM in Department 56, Holly J. Fujie, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/22/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lisett C. Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lisett C. Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Fernando Agustin-Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lisett C. Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Fernando Agustin-Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lisett C. Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Fernando Agustin-Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VALENCIA JESSE