This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2022 at 19:08:16 (UTC).

LISET PEREZ, VS CHIK ENTERPRISES

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 LISET PEREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CHIK ENTERPRISES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7088

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ LISET

Defendant

CHIK ENTERPRISES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DE SARIO JAMES A.

NOURMAND MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/02/2022

6/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/02/2022

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

5/26/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/20/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

5/20/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/20/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • Docketat 10:38 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/02/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Liset Perez, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Liset Perez, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Liset Perez, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Liset Perez, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE SARIO JAMES A.