This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2021 at 19:35:33 (UTC).

LISANA MEADE VS JULES HELM

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 LISANA MEADE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JULES HELM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9026

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEADE LISANA

Defendant

HELM JULES

Not Classified By Court

BAG FUND LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEEHAN SCOTT ALLEN

Defendant Attorney

MARKS PAUL

Not Classified By Court Attorney

FASEN LEO

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/31/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/31/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/4/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION

9/25/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION

Answer

9/24/2020: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/21/2021

1/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/21/2021

Notice of Lien

2/8/2021: Notice of Lien

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by Bag Fund LLC (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 01/21/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Filing of Notice of Removal of Action); Filed by JULES HELM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JULES HELM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LISANA MEADE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LISANA MEADE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LISANA MEADE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAG FUND LLC is a litigant