This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:48:45 (UTC).

LISA WINOKUR VS NVSI INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/22/2018 LISA WINOKUR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NVSI INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1016

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WINOKUR LISA

Defendants

NVSI INC

GREENBLATT FREDRIC J.

TD FORECLOSURE SERVICES

SKYLER YEFEM

LERMAN DAVID

NELSON ALEX

GREENBLATT & ASSOCIATES

FIRST POINT LENDING INC

Cross Plaintiff

NVSI INC.

Cross Defendants

ENGSTROM LIPSCOMB & LACK

SHUMAN STEVEN C.

WINOKUR LESA

JACOBS BRIAN J.

LACK WALTER J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUMAN STEVEN CRAIG

Defendant Attorneys

PFEIFER MICHAEL RAY ESQ.

GREENBLATT FREDRIC JAY ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SILVERMAN TIM J

Cross Defendant Attorneys

IRWIN ALAN DAVID

LACK WALTER JOHN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/16/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

7/17/2019: Notice of Ruling

Supplemental Declaration

8/1/2019: Supplemental Declaration

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/1/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice

8/5/2019: Notice

Order

8/5/2019: Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/5/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order

8/5/2019: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (C.C.P.. 170.6)

5/8/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (C.C.P.. 170.6)

DECLARATION OF LISA WINOKUR IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT ALEX NELSON'S AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE/ PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (C.C.P. ? 170.6)

5/16/2018: DECLARATION OF LISA WINOKUR IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT ALEX NELSON'S AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE/ PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (C.C.P. ? 170.6)

PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT ALEX NELSON'S AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE/ PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (C.C.P. ? 170.6)

5/16/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT ALEX NELSON'S AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE/ PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (C.C.P. ? 170.6)

RULING TO DENY PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6

5/21/2018: RULING TO DENY PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6

Minute Order

5/21/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/24/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service

6/1/2018: Proof of Service

DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

6/1/2018: DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT DAVID LERMAN; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

6/1/2018: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT DAVID LERMAN; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

194 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • Hearingat 09:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other (name extension)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Production of Business Records Pursuant to Subpoena and Request for Sanctions) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Production of Bu...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by NVSI, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketOrder (Granting NVSI's Motion to Compel Production of Business Records Pursuant to Subpoena and Request for Sanctions); Filed by Lisa Winokur (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Entry of Order Granting NVSI's Motion to Compel Production of Business Records Pursuant to Subpoena and Request for Sanctions); Filed by NVSI, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by NVSI, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
352 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDING ACTION [CCP 405.20]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Lisa Winokur (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lisa Winokur (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less