This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 00:16:45 (UTC).

LISA WELLER VS SHAHRIAR MONTESHAREI

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 LISA WELLER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHAHRIAR MONTESHAREI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0105

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLER LISA

Defendant

MONTESHAREI SHAHRIAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DAVID ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

GIBBS PATRICK J.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/14/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/14/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/14/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/14/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/14/2022: Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial

10/31/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/31/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/31/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2024
  • Hearing09/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2024
  • Hearing03/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2024
  • Hearing02/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: SHAHRIAR MONTESHAREI (Defendant); As to: LISA WELLER (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: SHAHRIAR MONTESHAREI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: SHAHRIAR MONTESHAREI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LISA WELLER (Plaintiff); As to: SHAHRIAR MONTESHAREI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LISA WELLER (Plaintiff); As to: SHAHRIAR MONTESHAREI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LISA WELLER (Plaintiff); As to: SHAHRIAR MONTESHAREI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less