This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/16/2023 at 11:36:14 (UTC).

LISA MILLER, ET AL. VS PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY FOUNDATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/03/2022 LISA MILLER, filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY FOUNDATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID K. REINERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0891

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID K. REINERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MILLER LISA

MILLER ROBERT

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 250 INCLUSIVE

PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DBA PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY- TORRANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEL BRUCE GARY

Defendant Attorney

COONEY JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 01/31/2023

1/31/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 01/31/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

1/31/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Statement

1/5/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/4/2023: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

12/6/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

Demand for Jury Trial

12/6/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DBA PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER, TORRANCE

12/6/2022: Answer - PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DBA PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER, TORRANCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/6/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (INCORRECT NAME)

11/9/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (INCORRECT NAME)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/17/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/14/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

10/14/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND ADDENDUM

10/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND ADDENDUM

Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR MEDICAL MALPRACTICE 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. LOSS OF CONSORTIUM

10/3/2022: Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR MEDICAL MALPRACTICE 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. LOSS OF CONSORTIUM

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES

10/7/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/7/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2024
  • Hearing02/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2024
  • Hearing02/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • Hearing08/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 08/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 02/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...) of 01/31/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M updated: Result Date to 01/31/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default scheduled for 01/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M updated: Result Date to 01/31/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default scheduled for 01/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Lisa Miller (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES; Filed by: Lisa Miller (Plaintiff); As to: Does 1 through 250, inclusive (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Deirdre Hill in Department M Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR MEDICAL MALPRACTICE 1. Negligence 2. Loss of Consortium; Filed by: Lisa Miller (Plaintiff); Robert Miller (Plaintiff); As to: Providence Little Company of Mary Foundation (Defendant); Does 1 through 250, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet and Addendum; Filed by: Lisa Miller (Plaintiff); Robert Miller (Plaintiff); As to: Providence Little Company of Mary Foundation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lisa Miller (Plaintiff); Robert Miller (Plaintiff); As to: Providence Little Company of Mary Foundation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less