This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2022 at 14:45:11 (UTC).

LISA KRAKOW, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 LISA KRAKOW, filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5032

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AZERAD FABIENNE SELLAM

AZERAD JEAN-LUC

FRANCOISE HUBSCHMAN AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE HUBSCHMAN FAMILY TRUST

GOLLER NATHAN

HUBSCHMAN ALEX

HUBSCHMAN FRANCOISE

HUBSCHMAN JEAN-PIERRE

HUBSCHMAN MILA

HUBSCHMAN SASHA

ILENE'S BOUTIQUE

JEAN-PIERRE HUBSCHMAN AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE HUBSCHMAN FAMILY TRUST

KRAKOW LISA

MASOM RICHARD JEFFREY

MASOM RICHARD O.

NATHAN GOLLER AS TRUSTEE OF THE NATHAN GOLLER REVOCABLE TRUST

NICHOLL JUSTIN

RICHARD JEFFREY MASOM AS TRUSTEE OF THE RICHARD J. MASOM 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST

STERN ILENE

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERTSON ALEXANDER IV

Defendant Attorney

DIXON ESQ DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

10/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

9/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

9/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING...)

7/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ALL ATTYS FOR STR...)

7/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ALL ATTYS FOR STR...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

6/9/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL BY BRIAN R. STRAN...)

1/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL BY BRIAN R. STRAN...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

2/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/12/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP)

10/18/2021: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP)

Unknown - DECLARATION RE: ADD-ON ON PETITION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANYS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

10/18/2021: Unknown - DECLARATION RE: ADD-ON ON PETITION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANYS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion - Other of Bakla...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 08/24/2022 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08/22/2022 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel all attys for Str...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference; Further Status Conference; Hearing...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice: Filed By: Lisa Krakow (Plaintiff); Result: Entered; Name Extension: Without Prejudice; As To Parties changed from Richard O. Masom (Plaintiff) to Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Lisa Krakow, et al. on 09/23/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Richard O. Masom as to Southern California Edison Company and Does 1 through 50, inclusive

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Lisa Krakow (Plaintiff); As to: Richard O. Masom (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Coordination Pending

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPetition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP); Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Add-On on Petition of Craig A. Fligor in Support of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY?S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); JCCP Number: JCCP5000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); As to: Lisa Krakow (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Lisa Krakow (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex ? Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lisa Krakow (Plaintiff); Richard Jeffrey Masom (Plaintiff); Richard Jeffrey Masom, as Trustee of the Richard J. Masom 2003 Revocable Trust (Plaintiff); Richard O. Masom (Plaintiff); Justin Nicholl (Plaintiff); Larry Stern (Plaintiff); Ilene Stern (Plaintiff); Ilene's Boutique (Plaintiff); Jean-Luc Azerad (Plaintiff); Fabienne Sellam Azerad (Plaintiff); Francoise Hubschman (Plaintiff); Jean-Pierre Hubschman (Plaintiff); Francoise Hubschman, as Co-Trustee of the Hubschman Family Trust Dated May 12, 2016 (Plaintiff); Jean-Pierre Hubschman, as Co-Trustee of the Hubschman Family Trust Dated May 12, 2016 (Plaintiff); Alex Hubschman (Plaintiff); Sasha Hubschman (Plaintiff); Mila Hubschman (Plaintiff); Nathan Goller (Plaintiff); Nathan Goller, as Trustee of the Nathan Goller Revocable Trust (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Does 1 through 50, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lisa Krakow (Plaintiff); Richard Jeffrey Masom (Plaintiff); Richard Jeffrey Masom, as Trustee of the Richard J. Masom 2003 Revocable Trust (Plaintiff); Richard O. Masom (Plaintiff); Justin Nicholl (Plaintiff); Larry Stern (Plaintiff); Ilene Stern (Plaintiff); Ilene's Boutique (Plaintiff); Jean-Luc Azerad (Plaintiff); Fabienne Sellam Azerad (Plaintiff); Francoise Hubschman (Plaintiff); Jean-Pierre Hubschman (Plaintiff); Francoise Hubschman, as Co-Trustee of the Hubschman Family Trust Dated May 12, 2016 (Plaintiff); Jean-Pierre Hubschman, as Co-Trustee of the Hubschman Family Trust Dated May 12, 2016 (Plaintiff); Alex Hubschman (Plaintiff); Sasha Hubschman (Plaintiff); Mila Hubschman (Plaintiff); Nathan Goller (Plaintiff); Nathan Goller, as Trustee of the Nathan Goller Revocable Trust (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Does 1 through 50, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lisa Krakow (Plaintiff); Richard Jeffrey Masom (Plaintiff); Richard Jeffrey Masom, as Trustee of the Richard J. Masom 2003 Revocable Trust (Plaintiff); Richard O. Masom (Plaintiff); Justin Nicholl (Plaintiff); Larry Stern (Plaintiff); Ilene Stern (Plaintiff); Ilene's Boutique (Plaintiff); Jean-Luc Azerad (Plaintiff); Fabienne Sellam Azerad (Plaintiff); Francoise Hubschman (Plaintiff); Jean-Pierre Hubschman (Plaintiff); Francoise Hubschman, as Co-Trustee of the Hubschman Family Trust Dated May 12, 2016 (Plaintiff); Jean-Pierre Hubschman, as Co-Trustee of the Hubschman Family Trust Dated May 12, 2016 (Plaintiff); Alex Hubschman (Plaintiff); Sasha Hubschman (Plaintiff); Mila Hubschman (Plaintiff); Nathan Goller (Plaintiff); Nathan Goller, as Trustee of the Nathan Goller Revocable Trust (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Does 1 through 50, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less