This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 01:19:57 (UTC).

LISA GARCIA VS GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 LISA GARCIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0521

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA LISA

Defendants

CARMAX BUSINESS SERVICES LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA CARMAX

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CARMAX AUTO SUPERSTORES CALIFORNIA LLC A VIRGINIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA CARMAX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

IBRAHIM JUSTIN NAZMI

BRAVO NICHOLAS

Defendant Attorneys

SHUGART JONATHAN M

MARTINEZ ROBERT

SCHLICHTER KURT ANDREW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Lisa Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/16/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Lisa Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Change of Handling Attorney on Behalf of Defendant CarMax Auto Superstores California, LLC); Filed by Carmax Auto Superstores California LLC, a Virginia limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Carmax Auto Superstores California LLC, a Virginia limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by General Motors, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Lisa Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Lisa Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lisa Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lisa Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lisa Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARMAX BUSINESS SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CARMAX AUTO SUPERSTORES CALIFORNIA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHLICHTER KURT