This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2020 at 00:38:45 (UTC).

LISA FREDEEN VS CALIFORNIA CEMETERY AND FUNERAL SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 05/18/2018 LISA FREDEEN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CALIFORNIA CEMETERY AND FUNERAL SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6930

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

FREDEEN LISA

MITCHUM SARA ANN

SHORES BRITTANY

Defendants and Respondents

ALDERWOODS GROUP(CALIFORNIA) INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

CALIFORNIA CEMETERY AND FUNERAL SERVICES

DIGNITY MEMORIAL

SCI CALIFORNIA FUNERAL SERVICES INC.

JONES & LEWIS CLEAR LAKE MEMORIAL CHAPEL

ALDERWOODS GROUPCALIFORNIA INC.

MEMORIAL DIGNITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MATERN MATTHEW J. ESQ.

Attorney at Matern Law Group

1230 Rosecrans Ave., Suite 200

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

MATERN MATTHEW JOHN ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CARRIE M. FRANCIS

FRANCIS CARRIE M.

FRANCIS CARRIE MARIE

 

Court Documents

Case Management Order

2/25/2019: Case Management Order

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

7/27/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Order - ORDER CMO AND IDC

3/5/2020: Order - ORDER CMO AND IDC

Proof of Service by Mail

12/12/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW J. SOKOLOWSKI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF LISA FREDEEN'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)

12/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW J. SOKOLOWSKI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF LISA FREDEEN'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW J. SOKOLOWSKI IN SUPPORT

12/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW J. SOKOLOWSKI IN SUPPORT

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

12/27/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

12/27/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS ON PLAINTIFF LISA FREDEEN'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES; PROPOSED ORDER

1/10/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS ON PLAINTIFF LISA FREDEEN'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES; PROPOSED ORDER

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

2/25/2019: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions, including dismissal, for P...)

2/25/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions, including dismissal, for P...)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/10/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

1/30/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/10/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

10/25/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Case Management Statement -

10/12/2018: Case Management Statement -

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

6/21/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT OF 2004

5/18/2018: COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT OF 2004

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • Hearing03/01/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Hearing02/11/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Hearing11/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to request for production of documents (set one)) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to special interrogatories (set one)) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to sp...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to sp...) of 10/19/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE RE SETTLEMENT, TRIAL DATE, AND ALL PRE-TRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES); Filed by Lisa Fredeen (Plaintiff); Brittany Shores (Plaintiff); Sara Ann Mitchum (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Status Conference (re Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Non-Appearance Case Review (Plaintiff's Report re Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Lisa Fredeen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Lisa Fredeen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT OF 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lisa Fredeen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC706930    Hearing Date: January 09, 2020    Dept: 24

Lonnie J. Williams, Jr.’s application to be admitted as counsel pro hac vice for Defendants California Cemetery and Funeral Services, LLC, SCI California Funeral Services, Inc., and Alderwoods Group (California), Inc. is GRANTED.

On May 18, 2018, Plaintiffs Lisa Fredeen, Brittany Shores, and Sara Ann Mitchum (“Plaintiffs”) brought the instant PAGA suit for Labor Code violations against their former employer Defendants California Cemetery and Funeral Services, LLC, SCI California Funeral Services, Inc., and Alderwoods Group (California), Inc. (“Defendants”).

On December 12, 2019, counsel Lonnie J. Williams, Jr. (“Applicant”) filed the instant application to appear as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants. No opposition was submitted.

CRC Rule 9.40 provides that an attorney in good standing in another jurisdiction may apply to appear pro hac vice in this State by way of written application upon due notice to all interested parties, as well as service on the State Bar in San Francisco with payment of a $50.00 fee, so long as that attorney is not a resident of California, does not work in California and does not perform regular or substantial business, professional or other activities in the State.

The written application must provide the following information: (1) applicant attorney’s residence and office addresses; (2) the courts to which the applicant attorney has been admitted and dates of admission; (3) a representation that the attorney applicant is a member in good standing in the courts of admission and is not currently suspended or disbarred in any court; (4) the title of each court and action in which the applicant attorney has appeared pro hac vice in this State in the preceding two years, if any; and (5) the name, address, and telephone number of the active California State Bar member who is counsel of record in the local action. (CRC Rule 9.40(d).)

The application satisfies rule 9.40. The declaration supplied enough information to satisfy the requirements. (Williams Decl., ¶¶ 1-10.) Accordingly, the application is GRANTED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.