This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 04:09:59 (UTC).

LISA EVANS VS PRECISION DELIVERY SYSTEMS INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 LISA EVANS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PRECISION DELIVERY SYSTEMS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2395

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVANS LISA

Defendants

ARCHIVE AMERICA INC

PEREZ BRYANT

PRECISION DELIVERY SYSTEMS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EISNER ALEXANDER C.

Defendant Attorney

FERREIRA CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

9/2/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/26/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/26/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

6/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

6/25/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/16/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2024
  • Hearing06/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • Hearing12/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Hearing11/30/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Lisa Evans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Lisa Evans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Precision Delivery Systems Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Precision Delivery Systems Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lisa Evans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lisa Evans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lisa Evans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EISNER ALEXANDER C