This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/31/2022 at 05:54:04 (UTC).

LISA DOUGLASS VS DR ANDREW FRANKEL MD

Case Summary

On 01/25/2017 LISA DOUGLASS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DR ANDREW FRANKEL MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8115

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Appellant

DOUGLASS LISA

Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

FRANKEL ANDREW M.D.

LASKY CLINIC SURGICAL CENTER INC.

MEDICAL BOARD OF CALIFORNIA DOE 1

UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DOE1

AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FACIAL PLASTIC RECON-

USC CARE MEDICAL GROUP INC. DOE 1

KECK GRADUATE INSTITUTE OF APPLIED LIFE

LASKY CLINIC SURGICAL CENTER INC. DOE2

CHOROOMI [DOE 3] SIM

Not Classified By Court

THE RAND COPORATION

CALIFORNIA SCIENCE CENTER FOUNDATION

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

GHALY CHRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINER SHELBY L.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

DEHAAS LOUIS H.

CAIN PATRICK J. ESQ.

LA FOLLETTE JOHNSON DE HAAS FESLER

DE HAAS LOUIS H. ESQ.

BURKWITZ GIL YOSEF

SAUNDERS TRINA L.

HOVSEPIAN MARIA

CAIN PATRICK J.

OZERAN DAVID J.

STEPANYAN GAGIK

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

BAGDASARIAN NARBEH

HELMER LESLIE

KRUMBEIN VANESSA C.

TAYLOR SONIA JANET

 

Court Documents

COURT RULING

12/19/2017: COURT RULING

Order - ORDER RE COURT'S ORDER ON MOTIONS TO TAX COST HEARING HELD 7/23/20

7/30/2020: Order - ORDER RE COURT'S ORDER ON MOTIONS TO TAX COST HEARING HELD 7/23/20

Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT PERTAINING TO DEFENDANTS' COST BILL

9/9/2020: Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT PERTAINING TO DEFENDANTS' COST BILL

Judgment - JUDGMENT COSTS JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FACIAL PLASTIC AND RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY, INC.

9/9/2020: Judgment - JUDGMENT COSTS JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FACIAL PLASTIC AND RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY, INC.

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/09/2020

9/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/09/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF JUDGMENT PERTAINING TO DEFENDANTS ANDREW S. FRANKEL, M.D., LASKEY CLINIC SURGICAL CENTER, LLC, AND SIM CHOROOMI, M.D.'S COST BILL

10/22/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF JUDGMENT PERTAINING TO DEFENDANTS ANDREW S. FRANKEL, M.D., LASKEY CLINIC SURGICAL CENTER, LLC, AND SIM CHOROOMI, M.D.'S COST BILL

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/6/2017: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION

6/9/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION

Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - APPELLATE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL NOA:04/05/19 B296843

1/30/2020: Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - APPELLATE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL NOA:04/05/19 B296843

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

5/1/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FORM INTERROGATORIES ON LASKY CLI...)]

5/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FORM INTERROGATORIES ON LASKY CLI...)]

Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B296843

5/4/2020: Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B296843

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/08/2020

6/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/08/2020

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX COSTS

7/8/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX COSTS

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE COSTS

7/10/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE COSTS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX PLAINTIFF'S COSTS; HEARI...) OF 07/23/2020

7/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX PLAINTIFF'S COSTS; HEARI...) OF 07/23/2020

505 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF JUDGMENT PERTAINING TO DEFENDANTS ANDREW S. FRANKEL, M.D., LASKEY CLINIC SURGICAL CENTER, LLC, AND SIM CHOROOMI, M.D.'S COST BILL); Filed by Sim Choroomi, M.D. Erroneously Sued As Sim Choroomi [DOE 3] (Defendant); ANDREW S. FRANKEL, M.D. Erroneously Sued As Andrew Frankel, M.D. (Defendant); Lasky Clinic Surgical Center, LLC Erroneously Sued As Lasky Clinic Surgical Center, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketJudgment (Judgment Pertaining To Defendants' Cost Bill); Filed by Sim Choroomi, M.D. Erroneously Sued As Sim Choroomi [DOE 3] (Defendant); ANDREW S. FRANKEL, M.D. Erroneously Sued As Andrew Frankel, M.D. (Defendant); Lasky Clinic Surgical Center, LLC Erroneously Sued As Lasky Clinic Surgical Center, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/09/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketJudgment (COSTS JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FACIAL PLASTIC AND RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY, INC.); Filed by American Academy of Facial Plastic Reconstructive Surgery, Inc. [DOE 2] (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/04/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketOrder (re Court's Order on Motions to tax cost hearing held 7/23/20); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
875 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Andrew M.D. Frankel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Andrew M.D. Frankel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lisa Douglass (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lisa Douglass (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Lisa Douglass 101 S. Sycamore Av. #5 Los Angeles, CA 90036

, i fl B 323-346-5175 %"“égb%iif‘ Lo& &fi%igi%’sl

DEC 04 2017

Sherri R. Carter, Exegutive Officer/Cler By 257 Deputy ancy Alvarez

THE SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, LOS ANGELES

LISA DOUGLASS, CASE NO.: BC648115

Plaintiffs, Assigned for all purposes to:

Judge: Hon. TERRY GREEN

Vs. Dept: 14

KECK GRADUATE INSTITUTE OF APPLIED LIFE

SCIENCES, INC.; AND LASKY CLINIC SURGICAL CENTER, INC., AND LESLIE STEVENS, MD., AND XAVIER BECCERA ATTORNEY GENERAL; AND

AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FACIAL PLASTIC AND

RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY, INC., AND USC CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC., AND THE DOCTOR'’S COMPANY, INC., AND COOPERATIVE OF AMERICAN PHYSICIANS, INC., AND EDUCATIONAL ) DATE: DECEMBER 14, 2017

AND RESEARCH FOUNDATION FOR THE AMERICAN

ACADEMY OF FACIAL PLASTIC AND ) TIME: 8:45

RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY, INC., AND DOES 1- 250, INCLUSIVE

NOTICE OF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT & EMERGENCY STAY O

) ) ) ) ) ANDREW S FRANKEL, MD, AN INDIVIDUAL AND ; ) ) )

) PROCEEDINGS

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LASKY CLINIC SURGICAL CENTER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE RAND CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA SCIENCE CENTER A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where KECK GRADUATE INSTITUTE OF APPLIED LIFE S is a litigant