This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 19:43:32 (UTC).

LISA ALDRICH VS OPTUM360 SERVICES INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 LISA ALDRICH filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against OPTUM360 SERVICES INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2679

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALDRICH LISA

Defendants

COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH

DE LA O TERESA DEL RIVERO

DIGNITY HEALTH

DIGNITY HEALTH-GLENDALE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CENTER

GLENDALE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CENTER

OPTUM360 SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGADZHANOV SUREN ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

BOUTROS MONICA

LYFTOGT MARISSA

PARKER AIMEE

 

Court Documents

Answer

11/8/2021: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/8/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

11/8/2021: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/16/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

11/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service

12/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/14/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

1/14/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

2/9/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/9/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/9/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

2/9/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

2/24/2022: Notice of Ruling

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • Hearing04/17/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • Hearing04/07/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • Hearing09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Lisa Aldrich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Dignity Health (Defendant); Glendale Memorial Hospital and Health Center (Defendant); Dignity Health-Glendale Memorial Hospital and Health Center (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Optum360 Services Inc. (Defendant); Teresa Del Rivero De La O (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Lisa Aldrich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Optum360 Services Inc. (Defendant); Teresa Del Rivero De La O (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Lisa Aldrich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lisa Aldrich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lisa Aldrich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Lisa Aldrich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lisa Aldrich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lisa Aldrich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lisa Aldrich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lisa Aldrich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases where OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GLENDALE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AND HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant