This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2023 at 18:29:44 (UTC).

LIONEL BRODERICK, ET AL. VS JIN BURCH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 LIONEL BRODERICK, filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JIN BURCH,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK A. YOUNG, CRAIG D. KARLAN, LISA K SEPE-WIESENFELD and EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1672

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK A. YOUNG

CRAIG D. KARLAN

LISA K SEPE-WIESENFELD

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRODERICK LIONEL

BRODERICK NANCY

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BURCH JIN

THOMPSON AUBRE

THOMPSON MICHAEL

THIRTEEN FIFTEEN AND THIRTEEN SEVENTEEN STANFORD STREET HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

CALI PROPERTY INC. FKA GOLD COAST PROPERTY PROS INC.

CLEVELAND JENNIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAN PHONG LE

Defendant Attorneys

STANTON MITCHEL

BREGMAN DAVID

NEWELL CHRISTINA J.

Cross Defendant Attorney

WINTER MEGAN CHRISTINE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

3/29/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER [CCP...)

3/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER [CCP...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER [CCP...) OF 03/21/2023

3/21/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER [CCP...) OF 03/21/2023

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

3/6/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/27/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

1/9/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

12/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

11/29/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

10/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

10/12/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AGA...)

10/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AGA...)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

10/6/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AGA...) OF 10/06/2022

10/6/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AGA...) OF 10/06/2022

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

10/5/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Ruling

9/28/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/15/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

6/22/2022: Case Management Statement

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/25/2023

Hearing09/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

Hearing09/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023

DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Lionel Broderick (Plaintiff); Nancy Broderick (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): Filed By: Nancy Broderick (Plaintiff),Lionel Broderick (Plaintiff); Result: Denied ; Result Date: 03/21/2023 ; As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer [CCP...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer [CCP...) of 03/21/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Lionel Broderick (Plaintiff); Nancy Broderick (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023

DocketNotice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Lionel Broderick (Plaintiff); Nancy Broderick (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023

DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Santa Monica Courthouse in Department N - Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld; Reason: Inventory Transfer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
75 More Docket Entries
11/19/2021

DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Broderick Nancy (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2021

DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Lionel Broderick (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2021

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lionel Broderick (Plaintiff); Broderick Nancy (Plaintiff); As to: Jin Burch (Defendant); Aubre Thompson (Defendant); Michael Thompson (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2021

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lionel Broderick (Plaintiff); Broderick Nancy (Plaintiff); As to: Jin Burch (Defendant); Aubre Thompson (Defendant); Michael Thompson (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lionel Broderick (Plaintiff); Broderick Nancy (Plaintiff); As to: Jin Burch (Defendant); Aubre Thompson (Defendant); Michael Thompson (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lionel Broderick (Plaintiff); Broderick Nancy (Plaintiff); As to: Jin Burch (Defendant); Aubre Thompson (Defendant); Michael Thompson (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2021

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2021

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2021

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2021

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark A. Young in Department M Santa Monica Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less