Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 06:58:45 (UTC).

LINUS OJUKWU, ET AL. VS PNC BANK, NA

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 LINUS OJUKWU filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PNC BANK, NA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0025

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OJUKWU LINUS

OJUKWU MAUREEN

Defendant

PNC BANK NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

IKONTE CHIJIOKE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

2/23/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/13/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/11/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • Hearing06/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by PNC Bank, NA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Linus Ojukwu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Linus Ojukwu (Plaintiff); Maureen Ojukwu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Linus Ojukwu (Plaintiff); Maureen Ojukwu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Linus Ojukwu (Plaintiff); Maureen Ojukwu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IKONTE CHIJIOKE OBINNAYA