This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2019 at 02:16:25 (UTC).

LINO CAMPOS RODRIGUEZ VS WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/23/2018 LINO CAMPOS RODRIGUEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9483

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ LINO CAMPOS

Defendants

WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION INC.

BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN RAY ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

SCALI CHRISTIAN JOSEPH

DALBY DAVID IAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/5/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

7/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice of Ruling

7/24/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR

7/24/2019: Notice - NOTICE TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MAE-ELAINE Q. DELOS SANTOS IN ADVANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

7/15/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MAE-ELAINE Q. DELOS SANTOS IN ADVANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

Notice - NOTICE OF NON FILING OF OPPOSITION TO WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION, INC.'S MOTION TO FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BASED PRIOR SETTLEMENT OF MATTER

7/16/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF NON FILING OF OPPOSITION TO WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION, INC.'S MOTION TO FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BASED PRIOR SETTLEMENT OF MATTER

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION HEARING DATE; DECLARATION OF MAE-ELAINE Q. DELOS SANTOS

4/11/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION HEARING DATE; DECLARATION OF MAE-ELAINE Q. DELOS SANTOS

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID I. DALBY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC. 'S EX P ARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION HEARING

4/11/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID I. DALBY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC. 'S EX P ARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION HEARING

Order - ORDER ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC. 'S EXP ARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION HEARING DATE

4/12/2019: Order - ORDER ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC. 'S EXP ARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION HEARING DATE

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION HEARING DATE

4/12/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION HEARING DATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING MOTION F...)

4/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING MOTION F...)

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT DEFENDANT WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION, INC'S STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

4/19/2019: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT DEFENDANT WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION, INC'S STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED 4/1...)

4/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED 4/1...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED 4/1...) OF 04/19/2019

4/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED 4/1...) OF 04/19/2019

Separate Statement

3/5/2019: Separate Statement

Affidavit - Affidavit COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION INCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

3/5/2019: Affidavit - Affidavit COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION INCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Declaration - Declaration Declaration of Shayna E. Dickstein iso Ex Parte Application

3/5/2019: Declaration - Declaration Declaration of Shayna E. Dickstein iso Ex Parte Application

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 40; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice, Entire Action); Filed by Lino Campos Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication (as to defendant BBSI) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Lino Campos Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketNotice (Taking Motion Off Calendar (West Coast Distribution Inc)); Filed by West Coast Distribution Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Lino Campos Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lino Campos Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOV'T CODE 1294O ET SEQ.; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less