This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 04:24:45 (UTC).

LING, CARRIE CHIN FENG - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 LING, CARRIE CHIN FENG - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JUAREZ, DANIEL and BARRY, WILLIAM. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2296

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JUAREZ, DANIEL

BARRY, WILLIAM

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TOWLE JANNE

Decedent

LING CARRIE CHIN FENG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NOGLE MEGAN F.

 

Court Documents

Receipt - Receipt of Final Distribution

9/20/2018: Receipt - Receipt of Final Distribution

Minute Order

6/13/2018: Minute Order

Account - Final or Waiver - First and Final Account and report of executor, Petition for final distribution

9/6/2017: Account - Final or Waiver - First and Final Account and report of executor, Petition for final distribution

Supplement - Supplement in Response to Probate Notes

6/5/2018: Supplement - Supplement in Response to Probate Notes

Minute Order

4/17/2017: Minute Order

Letters (Initial)

5/4/2017: Letters (Initial)

Minute Order

11/15/2017: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

11/3/2017: Substitution of Attorney

Account - Final or Waiver - First And Final Report of Executor, Waiver of Accounting, Waiver of Statutory Executor's Commissions; Waiver of Statutory Attorney Fees; And Petition For 1) Settlement and

3/29/2018: Account - Final or Waiver - First And Final Report of Executor, Waiver of Accounting, Waiver of Statutory Executor's Commissions; Waiver of Statutory Attorney Fees; And Petition For 1) Settlement and

PR_General Probate - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - CENTRAL PROBATE

3/16/2017: PR_General Probate - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - CENTRAL PROBATE

Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

9/20/2018: Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

3/23/2017: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Supplement - to Clear Probate Notes

4/5/2017: Supplement - to Clear Probate Notes

Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee - Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

11/7/2017: Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee - Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

3/16/2017: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Consent - Consent to Sale of Real Property and Terms Thereof

6/7/2018: Consent - Consent to Sale of Real Property and Terms Thereof

Notice - Hearing

4/5/2017: Notice - Hearing

Order - Order Approving First and Final Report

6/25/2018: Order - Order Approving First and Final Report

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2018
  • Receipt (Receipt of Final Distribution ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • TERM: Approval of Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Order (Order Approving First and Final Report ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • in Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Petition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Consent (Consent to Sale of Real Property and Terms Thereof ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet ); Filed by Decedent

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2017
  • Will (Admitted )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Supplement (to Clear Probate Notes ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Notice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Notice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Petition - Probate of Will (Initial) (Will - 11 pages ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less