This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2021 at 05:03:46 (UTC).

LINDA RUIZ VS VALUE DENTAL CENTERS OF CHINO CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 LINDA RUIZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against VALUE DENTAL CENTERS OF CHINO CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6543

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUIZ LINDA

Defendants

RJ HOUCHIN DENTAL PRACTICE INC.

VALUE DENTAL CENTERS OF CHINO CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LUCERO LINDA

LUCERO LINDA DARLENE

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...) OF 06/11/2021

6/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...) OF 06/11/2021

Order - Dismissal

6/11/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

6/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 10/13/2020

10/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 10/13/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

10/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

PI General Order

5/15/2019: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/13/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/13/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/13/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to File Proof of Service) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...) of 06/11/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of 10/13/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: COVID-19;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Linda Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Linda Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Linda Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Linda Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCERO LINDA DARLENE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCERO LINDA