This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2022 at 02:51:00 (UTC).

LINDA ROSA MADRID VS STEPHEN JANES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 LINDA ROSA MADRID filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STEPHEN JANES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4630

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MADRID LINDA ROSA

Defendants

JANES MARY E.

JANES STEPHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FARZAM JOSEPH S

Defendant Attorney

HOUGHTON LOWELL GEORGE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/7/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

2/7/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/7/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

2/7/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/7/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

2/7/2022: Complaint

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/7/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/17/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/17/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

3/18/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

3/18/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/18/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2025
  • Hearing02/03/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • Hearing08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • Hearing07/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Stephen Janes (Defendant); Mary E. Janes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Stephen Janes (Defendant); Mary E. Janes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Stephen Janes (Defendant); Mary E. Janes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Linda Rosa Madrid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Linda Rosa Madrid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Linda Rosa Madrid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Linda Rosa Madrid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Linda Rosa Madrid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARZAM, JOSEPH S