This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2022 at 13:40:44 (UTC).

LINDA M. ZEBARI, ET AL. VS FIRST RESPONSE LLC, A FOREIGN CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 LINDA M ZEBARI filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against FIRST RESPONSE LLC, A FOREIGN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, SERENA R. MURILLO and LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1427

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ZEBARI LINDA M.

YOUNG JEFFREY F.

LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FIRST RESPONSE LLC A FOREIGN CORPORATION

CVS HEALTH CORPORATION A FOREIGN CORPORATION

PLZ AEROSCIENCE CORPORATION A FOREIGN CORPORATION

MOULTON LOGISTICS MANAGEMENT A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SWIFT RESPONSE LLC A FOREIGN CORPORATION

K-G SPRAY-PAK INC.

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PLZ AEROSCIENCE CORPORATION A FOREIGN CORPORATION

MOULTON LOGISTICS MANAGEMENT A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SWIFT RESPONSE LLC A FOREIGN CORPORATION

APOLLO AEROSOL INDUSTRIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

STEIN JOHN

STARINIERI TERESA M.

STARINIERI TERESA MARIE ESQ.

SHAPIRSHTEYN NINA

STEIN JOHN ESQ.

Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

STARINIERI TERESA M.

STARINIERI TERESA MARIE ESQ.

LOFTON LAUREN

BIRNIE BRIAN W.

ROSENTHAL JOHN E.

STERNBERG ROBERT A.

STERNBERG ROBERT A. ESQ.

BIRNIE BRIAN W. ESQ.

FAENZA CHRISTOPHER EDWARD

GALLAGHER MICHAEL EDGAR JR

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

STERNBERG ROBERT A.

STERNBERG ROBERT A. ESQ.

GALLAGHER MICHAEL EDGAR JR

YUKEVICH JAMES J.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTIFICATION OF FILING COMPLETE DISMISSAL OF ACTION

4/21/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTIFICATION OF FILING COMPLETE DISMISSAL OF ACTION

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSTITION TO MOTION OF DEFENDANTS PLZ AEROPSACE

12/27/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSTITION TO MOTION OF DEFENDANTS PLZ AEROPSACE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/27/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAMES P. COLLINS IN OPPOSTION

12/27/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAMES P. COLLINS IN OPPOSTION

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

12/28/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF MARVIN R. HAVEN, PH.D. FILED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

12/28/2021: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF MARVIN R. HAVEN, PH.D. FILED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Separate Statement

12/28/2021: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CRISTINA M. CIMINELLI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITIONTO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

12/28/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CRISTINA M. CIMINELLI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITIONTO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Exhibit List

12/28/2021: Exhibit List

Reply - REPLY PLZ AEROSCIENCE CORPORATION AND APOLLO AEROSOL INDUSTRIES, LLCS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUM

12/30/2021: Reply - REPLY PLZ AEROSCIENCE CORPORATION AND APOLLO AEROSOL INDUSTRIES, LLCS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUM

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS PLZ AEROSCIENCE CORPORATION AND APOLLO AEROSOL INDUSTRIES, LLC'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

12/30/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS PLZ AEROSCIENCE CORPORATION AND APOLLO AEROSOL INDUSTRIES, LLC'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Objection - OBJECTION PLZ AEROSCIENCE CORPORATION AND APOLLO AEROSOL INDUSTRIES, LLCS OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF MARVIN R. HAVENS, PH.D. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR,

12/30/2021: Objection - OBJECTION PLZ AEROSCIENCE CORPORATION AND APOLLO AEROSOL INDUSTRIES, LLCS OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF MARVIN R. HAVENS, PH.D. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR,

Objection - OBJECTION PLZ AEROSCIENCE CORPORATION AND APOLLO AEROSOL INDUSTRIES, LLCS OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF JAMES P. COLLINS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE

12/30/2021: Objection - OBJECTION PLZ AEROSCIENCE CORPORATION AND APOLLO AEROSOL INDUSTRIES, LLCS OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF JAMES P. COLLINS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE

Response - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION

1/3/2022: Response - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS PLZ AEROSCIENCE CORPORATION AND APOLLO AEROSOL INDUSTRIES, LLC'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

1/3/2022: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS PLZ AEROSCIENCE CORPORATION AND APOLLO AEROSOL INDUSTRIES, LLC'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION

1/3/2022: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

1/3/2022: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

1/4/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

465 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • Hearing06/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketNotice (NOTIFICATION OF FILING COMPLETE DISMISSAL OF ACTION); Filed by Linda M. Zebari (Plaintiff); Jeffrey F. Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 57; Jury Trial (, 7-10 day estimate,) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 57; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion - Other (Motion for Violation of Court Order) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
572 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketSummons (- Amended); Filed by Linda M. Zebari (Plaintiff); Jeffrey F. Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint 1st; Filed by Linda M. Zebari (Plaintiff); Jeffrey F. Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Linda M. Zebari (Plaintiff); Linda M. Zebari (Plaintiff); Jeffrey F. Young (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Linda M. Zebari (Plaintiff); Jeffrey F. Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Linda M. Zebari (Plaintiff); Jeffrey F. Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Linda M. Zebari (Plaintiff); Jeffrey F. Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Linda M. Zebari (Plaintiff); Jeffrey F. Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1427    Hearing Date: February 07, 2020    Dept: 29

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 29 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the CENTRAL DISTRICT, LOS ANGELES, JUDGE STEVEN KLEIFIELD presiding in Department 57 for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APOLLO AEROSOL INDUSTRIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST RESPONSE LLC A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PLZ AEROSCIENCE CORPORATION A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant