Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 03:45:17 (UTC).

LINDA FIRESTONE VS KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 LINDA FIRESTONE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3072

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRESTONE LINDA

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KAISER PERMANENTE WOODLAND HILLS MEDICAL CENTER A BUSINESS FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER MATTHEW J.

Defendant Attorneys

HANDLIN REBECCA T.

CONDON BRIAN K.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Petition

4/21/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Motion to Compel Arbitration

4/21/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/21/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Association of Attorney

4/21/2021: Association of Attorney

Answer - ANSWER AMENDED

3/15/2021: Answer - ANSWER AMENDED

Answer

1/19/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

12/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

12/8/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2023
  • Hearing11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Hearing05/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • Hearing07/28/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer (AMENDED); Filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Linda Firestone (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Linda Firestone (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Linda Firestone (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Linda Firestone (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Linda Firestone (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Singer, Matthew J