This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 06:26:29 (UTC).

LINDA DE VILLERS VS. JENNYFER RODGERS & DOES 1-5. INCLUSIVE

Case Summary

On 03/15/2017 LINDA DE VILLERS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JENNYFER RODGERS DOES 1-5 INCLUSIVE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT B. BROADBELT and STUART M. RICE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1933

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE VILLERS LINDA

Defendants

RODGERS JENNYFER

DOES 1-5 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KEITH A. LOVENDOSKY

LOVENDOSKY KEITH A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

7/5/2018: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

7/5/2018: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Other -

7/12/2018: Other -

Other -

7/12/2018: Other -

Other -

7/12/2018: Other -

Other -

7/12/2018: Other -

Other -

7/12/2018: Other -

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • MOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • MOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • MOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • MOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF DEMURRER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by JENNYFER RODGERS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by LINDA DE VILLERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Proof of Service (OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: JENNYFER RODGERS BY SUB-SERVICE TO YOSZMINE MARRERO ON 3/30/17 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by LINDA DE VILLERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Summons; Filed by LINDA DE VILLERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVENDOSKY KEITH A.