This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2022 at 15:20:24 (UTC).

LINDA CANAS VS SHAHEEN ZADORI

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 LINDA CANAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHAHEEN ZADORI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6674

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANAS LINDA

Defendant

ZADORI SHAHEEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WRIGHT TIMOTHY DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/19/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/19/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

5/19/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

5/19/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/19/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2024
  • Hearing05/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2023
  • Hearing11/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2023
  • Hearing11/02/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Linda Canas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Linda Canas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Linda Canas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WRIGHT TIMOTHY D. ESQ.