This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2019 at 00:10:30 (UTC).

LINCOLN ONE CORPORATION ET AL VS STEVEN J HORN

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 LINCOLN ONE CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against STEVEN J HORN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4322

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KLING ANTHONY N.

3123 SMB LLC

LINCOLN ONE CORPORATION

KLING CORPORATION

Defendant

HORN STEVEN J

Encino, CA 91436

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLING ANTHONY N

Defendant Attorneys

HORN STEVEN JEFFRY

BELAGA JONATHAN JEREMY

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

2/13/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/14/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Related Case

10/16/2018: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case

10/16/2018: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/23/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown

12/13/2018: Unknown

Unknown

10/19/2018: Unknown

Notice

12/13/2018: Notice

Minute Order

12/13/2018: Minute Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/14/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Unknown

11/29/2018: Unknown

Response

11/15/2018: Response

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/23/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

10/19/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Proof of Personal Service

10/12/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (C.C.P., ? 170.6)

10/9/2018: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (C.C.P., ? 170.6)

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGN4ENT

10/4/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGN4ENT

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

10/4/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference (as to BC724322 and LS030356)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by 3123 SMB LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Lincoln One Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lincoln One Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 40; Court Order - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/13/2018); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order) of 12/13/2018); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketNotice (name extension) (OF DEPT 40 RULING OF 12/13/18 : A) DEEMING THIS ACTION RELATED TO LEAD CASE BC682318 B) VACATING ALL HEARING DATES & TRANSFERRING CASE TO DEPT 40 C) RESCHEDULING OF HEARING DATES D) DEEMING COUNSEL DAVID KNIERIEM ADMITTED PRO-HAC); Filed by Anthony N. Kling (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketPlaintiffs' [Notice] of Related Case; Filed by Lincoln One Corporation (Plaintiff); 3123 SMB LLC (Plaintiff); Kling Corporation (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketAmended Notice of Related Cases; Filed by Steven J Horn (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kling Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Steven J Horn (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGN4ENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lincoln One Corporation (Plaintiff); 3123 SMB LLC (Plaintiff); Kling Corporation (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less