This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2023 at 00:07:55 (UTC).

LINA ISSA VS COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 LINA ISSA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, A WASHINGTON CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1078

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISSA LINA

Defendant

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARPENTER JOHN C.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/28/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/30/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2023
  • Hearing04/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • Hearing02/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. John J. Kralik in Department B Burbank Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LINA ISSA (Plaintiff); As to: COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LINA ISSA (Plaintiff); As to: COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LINA ISSA (Plaintiff); As to: COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARPENTER JOHN C. ESQ.