Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2020 at 15:27:19 (UTC).

LIN MA DDS INC. VS. OSCAR TOSCANO

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 LIN MA DDS INC filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against OSCAR TOSCANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. MATZ, JAMES R. DUNN, RAMONA G. SEE and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7739

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. MATZ

JAMES R. DUNN

RAMONA G. SEE

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Not Classified By Court

LIN MA DDS INC.

LIN MA

MA LIN

TOSCANO OSCAR

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court

TOSCANO OSCAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

WIENER SETH W.

WIENER SETH WESLEY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

TOSCANO OSCAR E.

TOSCANO OSCAR ERNESTO

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/20/2018: Complaint

Notice - NOTICE OF OSC

2/20/2018: Notice - NOTICE OF OSC

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: SUMMONS ISSUED

2/21/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: SUMMONS ISSUED

Notice of Related Case

3/2/2018: Notice of Related Case

Answer

4/12/2018: Answer

Cross-Complaint

4/12/2018: Cross-Complaint

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQUEST

4/18/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQUEST

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

4/27/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

Case Management Statement

5/23/2018: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/23/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

5/29/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-06-08 00:00:00

6/8/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-06-08 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

7/17/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

7/26/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 10/10/2019

10/10/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 10/10/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

4/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/15/2020

4/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/15/2020

Request For Copies -

9/7/2018: Request For Copies -

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • Hearing05/10/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Hearing04/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Hearing01/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Lin Ma DDS, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department STL-D, Ramona G. See, Presiding; MSC Timeslot (Judge James R. Dunn) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department STL-C, James R. Dunn, Presiding; MSC Timeslot (Judge James R. Dunn)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketBrief (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF SUBMITTED BY OSCAR TOSCANO); Filed by Oscar Toscano (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Status Conference ((Post-Mandatory Settlement Conference_) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (Post-Mandatory Settlement Conference_; Tri...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Lin Ma DDS, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketNotice (OF RELATED CASE TO BC648275 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketNotice (OF OSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint Fld - No Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOSCANO OSCAR