Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 10:56:01 (UTC).

LIN, HUSEN VS LI, LINA

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 LIN, HUSEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LI, LINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6078

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LIN HUSEN

Respondent

LI LINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2018
  • Mail - Returned Mail (RE Notice of Entry of Judgment )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Mail - Returned Mail (RE Notice of Entry of Judgment )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (sent to judicial officer ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 2A, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less