Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2020 at 22:11:43 (UTC).

LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY NORMANDIYA VS TECHSON ELECTRONICS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY NORMANDIYA filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against TECHSON ELECTRONICS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0015

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY NORMANDIYA AKA NORMANDIYA LLC

Defendant

TECHSON ELECTRONICS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDSMAN PHILIP

Defendant Attorney

SZKOPEK AGNES MONICA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...)

6/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...)

Order - ORDER RE: MOTION PURSUANT TO CCP 1030 FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN UNDERTAKING, NOTICE OF CMC, DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

6/29/2020: Order - ORDER RE: MOTION PURSUANT TO CCP 1030 FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN UNDERTAKING, NOTICE OF CMC, DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE PAM MYERS, CSR #12940

6/29/2020: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE PAM MYERS, CSR #12940

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...) OF 06/29/2020, COURT'S ORDER

6/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...) OF 06/29/2020, COURT'S ORDER

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT

6/22/2020: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT

6/22/2020: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT

Order - ORDER VACATING 3/24/20 ORDER THAT OPPOSITION AND REPLY TO MOTION FOR UNDERTAKING IS DUE PER THE ORIGINAL MOTION HEARING DATE

6/2/2020: Order - ORDER VACATING 3/24/20 ORDER THAT OPPOSITION AND REPLY TO MOTION FOR UNDERTAKING IS DUE PER THE ORIGINAL MOTION HEARING DATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/11/2020

5/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/11/2020

Reply - REPLY REPLY ISO MOTION FOR UNDERTAKING & STAY

4/20/2020: Reply - REPLY REPLY ISO MOTION FOR UNDERTAKING & STAY

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADVANCE THE DATE OF DEF'S MOTION FOR AN UNDERTAKING AND STAY

3/18/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADVANCE THE DATE OF DEF'S MOTION FOR AN UNDERTAKING AND STAY

Proof of Service by Mail

2/26/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration - DECLARATION A. MONICA SZKOPEK'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

2/26/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION A. MONICA SZKOPEK'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

Notice of Motion

2/26/2020: Notice of Motion

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN UNDERTAKING AND; STAYING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS

2/26/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN UNDERTAKING AND; STAYING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SETTING THE CASE FOR A CASE MAN...)

2/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SETTING THE CASE FOR A CASE MAN...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SETTING THE CASE FOR A CASE MAN...) OF 02/03/2020

2/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SETTING THE CASE FOR A CASE MAN...) OF 02/03/2020

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/8/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY NORMANDIYA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss); Filed by TECHSON ELECTRONICS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Filed by TECHSON ELECTRONICS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (ISO Motion to Dismiss); Filed by TECHSON ELECTRONICS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by TECHSON ELECTRONICS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (Motion for an Undertaking to Secure an Award of Costs and Attorney's Fees (CCP 1030)) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Pam Myers, CSR #12940); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketMotion for Order (Requiring Plaintiff to File an Undertaking and; Staying Further Proceedings); Filed by TECHSON ELECTRONICS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (in Support); Filed by TECHSON ELECTRONICS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (in Support); Filed by TECHSON ELECTRONICS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by TECHSON ELECTRONICS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docketat 1:26 PM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Setting the Case for a Case Man...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Setting the Case for a Case Man...) of 02/03/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY NORMANDIYA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY NORMANDIYA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY NORMANDIYA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20VECP00015    Hearing Date: September 21, 2020    Dept: T

TENTATIVE RULING

LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY V TECHSON ELECTRONICS

20VECV00015

MOTION TO DISMISS

9/21/2020

MOTION IS GRANTED.

THE COURT ORDERS CLERK OF THE COURT TO ENTER A JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 581(f)(2) IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO AMEND AFTER DEMURRER WAS SUSTAINED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND.  THE DEMURRER WAS SUSTAINED ON 6/29/2020 WITH 20 DAYS LEAVE TO AMEND.  NOTICE WAS GIVEN BY THE CLERK OF THE COURT ON 6/29/2020.  THE AMENDED COMPLAINT SHOULD HAVE BEEN FILED BY 7/24/2020.  NO AMENDED COMPLAINT HAS BEEN FILED.  PLAINTIFF LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY NORMANDIYA aka NORMANDIYA LLC  SHALL TAKE AND RECOVER NOTHING IN THIS ACTION FROM DEFENDANT TECHSON ELECTRONICS, INC. COSTS PER MEMORANDUM OF COSTS.

IT IS SO ORDERED.  DEFENDANT TO GIVE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SZKOPEK AGNES MONICA