This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2022 at 13:32:45 (UTC).

LILY THORNDIKE, ET AL. VS NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 LILY THORNDIKE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4930

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LILY THORNDIKE A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITE JAYELLE THORNDIKE

THORNDIKE JAYELLE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

UNIVERSAL STUDIOS LLC DBA UNIVERSAL CITYWALK HOLLYWOOD A CORPORATION

UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS LLC DBA UNIVERSAL STUDIOS HOLLYWOOD A CORPORATION

NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC A CORPORATION

UNIVERSAL PARKS & RESORTS MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC A CORPORATION

UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS LLC

OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

Cross Defendant and Defendant

OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEA ADAM KENT

Defendant Attorneys

SCHRIEFFER PAUL

WARD EDWARD E. JR.

Cross Defendant Attorney

GOLODNITSKA VALERIA

 

Court Documents

Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

5/1/2020: Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

Answer

5/5/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/5/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/05/2020

5/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/05/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING

5/13/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING

5/13/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING

Notice - NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS COMPLAINT

9/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT)

9/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT)

Notice of Ruling

9/14/2020: Notice of Ruling

Cross-Complaint

9/16/2020: Cross-Complaint

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

10/9/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION PURSUANT TO CRC RULE 2.550, ET SEQ.

10/26/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION PURSUANT TO CRC RULE 2.550, ET SEQ.

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY RE PROTECTIVE ORDER

10/29/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY RE PROTECTIVE ORDER

Proof of Personal Service

11/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

11/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Answer

11/30/2020: Answer

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ORDER CONTINUING DATES FOR TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES

1/6/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ORDER CONTINUING DATES FOR TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • Hearing07/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Hearing06/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Hearing05/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an Order Continuing Trial by Joint Stipulation) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Defendant Universal City Studios, LLC's Ex Parte Application ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for an Order Continuing Trial by Joint Stipulation); Filed by UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LILY THORNDIKE, a minor by and through her Guardian ad Lite, Jayelle thorndike (Plaintiff); Jayelle Thorndike (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LILY THORNDIKE, a minor by and through her Guardian ad Lite, Jayelle thorndike (Plaintiff); Jayelle Thorndike (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LILY THORNDIKE, a minor by and through her Guardian ad Lite, Jayelle thorndike (Plaintiff); Jayelle Thorndike (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LILY THORNDIKE, a minor by and through her Guardian ad Lite, Jayelle thorndike (Plaintiff); Jayelle Thorndike (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LILY THORNDIKE, a minor by and through her Guardian ad Lite, Jayelle thorndike (Plaintiff); Jayelle Thorndike (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LILY THORNDIKE, a minor by and through her Guardian ad Lite, Jayelle thorndike (Plaintiff); Jayelle Thorndike (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Lily); Filed by Jayelle Thorndike (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******4930 Hearing Date: July 6, 2022 Dept: 28

The Court would like to speak with the Petitioner and Claimant.


Case Number: *******4930 Hearing Date: April 26, 2022 Dept: 28

Motion to Continue Trial

Having considered the moving, opposing and reply papers, the Court rules as follows.

BACKGROUND

On July 16, 2019, Plaintiffs Lily Thorndike (“Lily”), a minor by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Jayelle Thorndike, and Jayelle Thorndike (“Jayelle”) filed this action against Defendants NBCUniversal Media, LLC (“NBC”), Universal City Studios LLC (“UCS”), Universal Studios LLC (“US”), Universal Parks & Resorts Management Services LLC (“UPRMS”) for negligence, premises liability, and negligent infliction of emotional distress. On September 26, 2019, Defendants filed their answer.

On December 4, 2019, Plaintiffs filed a request for dismissal of all previously named Defendants, which the Court granted. On December 30, 2019, Plaintiffs amended the complaint to include Defendant Universal City Studios, LLC (“Universal”). Universal filed an answer to the complaint on May 5, 2020.

On September 16, 2020, Universal filed a Cross-Complaint against Otis Elevator Company (“Otis”) for express indemnity, equitable indemnity, breach of contract, contribution, and declaratory relief. On November 30, 2020, Otis filed its answer to the Cross-Complaint.

Plaintiff later amended the complaint to include Otis as a defendant. Otis filed its answer on October 4, 2021.

On March 30, 2022, Otis filed a Motion to Continue Trial to be heard on April 26, 2022. On April 13, 2022, Plaintiffs filed an opposition. On April 19, 2022, Otis filed its reply.

Trial is currently scheduled for June 3, 2022.

PARTY’S REQUESTS

Otis requests the Court continue trial to November 7, 2022, or any date after, to enable Otis’s Motion for Summary Judgment, which is set to be heard on August 16, 2022.

LEGAL STANDARD

CRC rule 3.1332(b) outlines that “a party seeking a continuance of the date set for trial, whether contested or uncontested or stipulated to by the parties, must make the request for a continuance by a noticed motion or an ex parte application under the rules in chapter 4 of this division, with supporting declarations. The party must make the motion or application as soon as reasonably practical once the necessity for the continuance is discovered.”

Under CRC 3.1332(c), The Court may grant a continuance only on an affirmative showing of good cause requiring the continuance. Circumstances that may indicate good cause include “a party's excused inability to obtain essential testimony, documents, or other material evidence despite diligent efforts.” The Court should consider all facts and circumstances relevant to the determination, such as proximity of the trial date, prior continuances, prejudice suffered, whether all parties have stipulated to a continuance, and whether the interests of justice are served. CRC 3.1332(d).

DISCUSSION

Good Cause

There exists good cause to continue trial. The depositions of Plaintiffs did not occur until February 2022, despite being noticed in July 2021, due to scheduling conflicts on the part of the Plaintiffs. Similarly, Universal’s PMK’s deposition only occurred in March 2022, again due to scheduling conflicts. The site inspection for the area of the incident, despite being timely noticed in August 2021, is not set to occur until late April 2022. Otis needs all of this information in order to prepare a thorough Motion for Summary Judgment; Otis has already reserved a date of August 16, 2022, for the hearing on this motion. However, this date occurs after trial. As Otis is still awaiting the completion of discovery in order to prepare the motion, specially setting a hearing on the Motion for Summary Judgment is not feasible. Thus, there is good cause to continue trial; Otis has been unable to obtain essential discovery via no fault of its own. Otis will be prejudiced if not allowed to have its Motion for Summary Judgment heard, especially when any cause for delay has been due to other party’s scheduling issues.

Plaintiffs argue that the motion should not be granted as all parties stipulated to the current trial date in December 2021, after Otis had already made the reservation for the Motion for Summary Judgment. They argue that Defendant should not be rewarded with a trial continuance for their failure to timely raise this issue.

CONCLUSION

Defendant Otis Elevator Company’s Motion to Continue Trial is DENIED. There is no motion for summary judgment pending. The Court is disinclined to grant a trial continuance on the chance that a motion for summary judgment might get filed. Moreover, Otis Elevator stipulated in December of 2021 to continue the trial to its current June 3, 2022 date. There is no good cause shown to continue the current trial date.



Case Number: *******4930    Hearing Date: September 11, 2020    Dept: 28

Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint

Having considered the moving papers, the Court rules as follows. has been filed.

BACKGROUND

On July 16, 2019, Plaintiffs Lily Thorndike, a minor by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Jayelle Thorndike and Jayelle Thorndike (“Plaintiffs”) filed a complaint against Defendants NBCUniversal Media, LLC; Universal City Studios LLC dba Universal Studios Hollywood; Universal Studios LLC dba Univeral Citywalk Hollywood; Universal Parks & Resorts Management Services LLC; and Does 1 through 50 for (1) negligence, (20 premises liability, and (3) negligent infliction of emotional distress.  The complaint alleges Plaintiff Lily was injured using the escalators going from the Lower Lot of the Universal Studios Hollywood Park to the Upper Lot when her gloved right hand caught between the raised circle on the stationary rail and the moving escalator railing.

On December 26, 2019, dismissal was entered as to Defendants NBCUniversal Media, LLC; Universal City Studios LLC; Universal Studios LLC; and Universal Parks & resorts Management Services LLC.

On December 30, 2019, Plaintiffs filed an amendment to complaint, substituting in Universal City Studios, LLC for Doe 1.

On May 1, 2020, Defendant Universal City Studios LLC (“Defendant”) filed the motion for leave to file a cross-complaint.

Trial is set for January 12, 2021.

PARTYS REQUEST

Defendant Universal City Studios LLC seeks leave to file a cross-complaint against Otis Elevator Company and Roes 1 to 50 for breach of contract, express indemnity, equitable indemnity, contribution, and declaratory relief.

LEGAL STANDARD

CCP section 428.10 provides the following:

A party against whom a cause of action has been asserted in a complaint or cross-complaint may file a cross-complaint setting forth either or both of the following:

(a) Any cause of action he has against any of the parties who filed the complaint or cross-complaint against him. Nothing in this subdivision authorizes the filing of a cross-complaint against the plaintiff in an action commenced under Title 7 (commencing with Section 1230.010) of Part 3.

(b) Any cause of action he has against a person alleged to be liable thereon, whether or not such person is already a party to the action, if the cause of action asserted in his cross-complaint (1) arises out of the same transaction, occurrence, or series of transactions or occurrences as the cause brought against him or (2) asserts a claim, right, or interest in the property or controversy which is the subject of the cause brought against him.

(Code Civ. Proc., ; 428.10.)

After the trial date has been set, a party seeking to file a cross-complaint must obtain leave of court.  (Code Civ. Proc., ; 428.50(b).)  Leave may be granted in the interest of justice at any time during the course of the action.  (Id., ; 428.50(c).)  Indeed, where a cause of action would otherwise be lost, leave to amend is appropriate even if the party was negligent in not moving for leave to amend earlier.  “The legislative mandate is clear.  A policy of liberal construction of section 426.50 to avoid forfeiture of causes of action is imposed on the trial court.  A motion to file a cross-complaint at any time during the course of the action must be granted unless bad faith of the moving party is demonstrated where forfeiture would otherwise result.”  (Silver Organizations, Ltd. v. Frank (1990) 217 Cal.App.3d 94, 98-99.)

“Cross-complaints for comparative equitable indemnity would appear virtually always ;transactionally ;related to the main action.” ; ;(Time for Living, Inc. v. Guy Hatfield Homes ;(1991) 230 Cal.App.3d 30, 38.) ;

DISCUSSION

Defendant argues the proposed cross-complaint arise out of the same transaction, occurrence, or series of transactions or occurrences as the claims brought against Defendant by Plaintiffs as Defendant is seeking defense and indemnification from Otis Elevator Company for the injuries Plaintiff allegedly sustained as a result of Otis’s performance of construction services for Defendant. Defendant argues that Otis is a potential and concurrent tortfeasor under the facts as Otis had control over the area during the time Plaintiff allegedly sustained injuries and Otis’s acts and/or omissions caused and/or contributed to Plaintiff’s alleged injuries.  Defendant asserts that allowing it to litigate its claims against Otis in the same action as Plaintiff’s complaint will preserve judicial resources, reduce litigation expenses, and promote global resolution of the entire matter.

The Court finds the proposed cross-complaint arises out of the same transaction and occurrence as the claims asserted against DefendantThe Court will thus permit Defendant to file the cross-complaint in the interest of justice.

No opposition has been filed.

CONCLUSION

Based on the foregoing, the motion is GRANTED.

Defendant is ordered to file and serve the proposed cross-complaint within 10 days of this ruling.

Defendant is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions. ;