This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2021 at 02:35:26 (UTC).

LILY MORALES BARRIOS VS BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 LILY MORALES BARRIOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3382

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORALES BARRIOS LILY

Defendants

BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION AKA EL SUPER

MARTINEZ EVERARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PRICE MATTHEW

FIELDING CLARK

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/10/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Association of Attorney

9/23/2021: Association of Attorney

PI General Order

10/8/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2024
  • Hearing09/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • Hearing03/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • Hearing02/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Lily Morales Barrios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lily Morales Barrios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lily Morales Barrios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lily Morales Barrios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lily Morales Barrios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRICE MATTHEW