Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2020 at 01:54:11 (UTC).

LILLIAN HADAWAY VS ENERGY PHYSICAL THERAPY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 LILLIAN HADAWAY filed an Other lawsuit against ENERGY PHYSICAL THERAPY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTOPHER K. LUI and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6102

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HADAWAY LILLIAN

Defendants

KARCHEMSKY JULIA

ENERGY PHYSICAL THERAPY

ENERGY PHYSICAL THERAPY INC. ESA ENERGY PHYSICAL THERAPY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WORTH ROBERT J.

Defendant Attorney

MAEDER VINCENT A

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/20/2020: Request for Dismissal

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

12/5/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/18/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer

2/22/2019: Answer

Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/22/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Notice of Deposit - Jury

3/22/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/26/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/26/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/26/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/26/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Julia Karchemsky (Defendant); Energy Physical Therapy, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Julia Karchemsky (Defendant); Energy Physical Therapy, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Vincent A Maeder (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Lillian Hadaway (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Julia Karchemsky (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Julia Karchemsky (Defendant); Energy Physical Therapy, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lillian Hadaway (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lillian Hadaway (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less