This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/25/2022 at 08:49:33 (UTC).

LILIYA NIKOGHOSYAN VS GLENDALE TRANSITIONAL CARE CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2022 LILIYA NIKOGHOSYAN filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against GLENDALE TRANSITIONAL CARE CENTER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7207

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NIKOGHOSYAN LILIYA

Defendants

ADVENTIST HEALTH GLENDALE

GLENDALE TRANSITIONAL CARE CENTER

ISAYAN SONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AVANESOV ESQ. IVETTA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/23/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/19/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/19/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/19/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

8/19/2022: Complaint

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

11/22/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of the Summons and Complaint scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/20/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketAddress for Ivetta Avanesov, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketAddress for Ivetta Avanesov, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Ivetta Avanesov, Esq. (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketAddress for Ivetta Avanesov, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert B. Broadbelt in Department 53 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Liliya Nikoghosyan (Plaintiff); As to: Glendale Transitional Care Center (Defendant); Adventist Health Glendale (Defendant); Sona Isayan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Liliya Nikoghosyan (Plaintiff); As to: Glendale Transitional Care Center (Defendant); Adventist Health Glendale (Defendant); Sona Isayan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Liliya Nikoghosyan (Plaintiff); As to: Glendale Transitional Care Center (Defendant); Adventist Health Glendale (Defendant); Sona Isayan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less