This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2022 at 03:08:18 (UTC).

LILIANA MIER VS CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 LILIANA MIER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2647

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIER LILIANA

Defendants

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC.

CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU INC.

SIGAL MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOUMANIAN NANCY PRAPION

Defendant Attorney

WAGNER JOSHUA B.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

9/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

9/16/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Notice of Ruling

9/21/2022: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

9/7/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/1/2022: Case Management Statement

Motion to Compel Arbitration

7/19/2022: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSHUA B. WAGNER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/19/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSHUA B. WAGNER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF EMMA MENDEZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/19/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF EMMA MENDEZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

7/19/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Case Management Statement

7/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF LILIANA MIER SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/28/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF LILIANA MIER SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS AND REQUEST TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF EMMA MENDEZ SUBMITTED WITH DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/28/2022: Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS AND REQUEST TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF EMMA MENDEZ SUBMITTED WITH DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Case Management Statement

7/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR 402 EVIDENTIARY HEARING REGARDING EXISTENCE OF AGR

7/28/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR 402 EVIDENTIARY HEARING REGARDING EXISTENCE OF AGR

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO THEIR MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

8/3/2022: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO THEIR MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE 8102022 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND 8112022 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

8/3/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE 8102022 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND 8112022 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/24/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/26/2022: Answer

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2023
  • Hearing06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: California Service Bureau Inc. (Defendant); Michael Sigal (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Arbitration reservation no.: 244930245127: Filed By: California Service Bureau Inc. (Defendant),Michael Sigal (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Liliana Mier (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Binding Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Case Management Conf...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 09/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24 updated: Result Date to 09/16/2022; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Joshua B Wagner in support of defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration reservation no.: 244930245127: Name Extension changed from OF JOSHUA B. WAGNER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION to of Joshua B Wagner in support of defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration reservation no.: 244930245127; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketAddress for Nancy Prapion Doumanian (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kristin S. Escalante in Department 24 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LILIANA MIER (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. (Defendant); CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU INC. (Defendant); MICHAEL SIGAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LILIANA MIER (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. (Defendant); CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU INC. (Defendant); MICHAEL SIGAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LILIANA MIER (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. (Defendant); CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU INC. (Defendant); MICHAEL SIGAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUMANIAN NANCY PRAPION