This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/08/2023 at 06:52:58 (UTC).

LILIA MORA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 LILIA MORA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U S A , INC , A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1202

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORA AN INDIVIDUAL LILIA

Defendants

TOYOTA MOTOR SALES U.S.A. INC. A CORPORATION

TOYOTA PASADENA A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR NORMAN F.

Defendant Attorney

MURPHY THOMAS MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/1/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/1/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/1/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

12/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

1/18/2023: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

1/18/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 02/09/2023

2/9/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 02/09/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

2/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • Hearing05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 02/09/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 02/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Toyota Pasadena, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant); As to: Lilia Mora, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Toyota Pasadena, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Lilia Mora, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Toyota Pasadena, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/23/2022; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Lilia Mora, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 12/19/2022; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department X Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lilia Mora, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Toyota Pasadena, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lilia Mora, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Toyota Pasadena, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lilia Mora, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Toyota Pasadena, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less