Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 02:15:56 (UTC).

LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON VS REZA SADEGHI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against REZA SADEGHI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON, ARMEN TAMZARIAN and WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8322

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDOZA MOGOLLON LILIA

Defendants

SADEGHI JANET

FAUSTO DURAN

SADEGHI REZA

FAUSTO SUSANA

BARAJAS LUIS M

MAYA EVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHIU SYLVIA

MORALYAN EMMA

Defendant Attorney

PEMSTEIN JASON M.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF RESERVATION OF RIGHT TO SEEK PUNITIVE DAMAGES

6/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RESERVATION OF RIGHT TO SEEK PUNITIVE DAMAGES

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/27/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

3/24/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SYLVIA CHIU IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANTS YO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

3/24/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SYLVIA CHIU IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANTS YO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Motion for Protective Order

3/26/2021: Motion for Protective Order

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DOUGLAS L. DAY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

3/26/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DOUGLAS L. DAY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Reply - REPLY BRIEF AND NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANTS REZA AND JANET SADEGHI TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCT

4/12/2021: Reply - REPLY BRIEF AND NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANTS REZA AND JANET SADEGHI TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCT

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

4/13/2021: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

11/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

10/28/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

10/28/2020: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE-ASSIGNING CASE

10/22/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE-ASSIGNING CASE

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) AGAINST JUDGE: SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

10/9/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) AGAINST JUDGE: SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

Proof of Personal Service

10/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

10/13/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/8/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • Hearing09/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Hearing08/27/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Status Conference (Re Settlement Options/Discovery) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re Settlement Options/Discovery)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketOpposition (OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS: DECLARATION OF DOUGLAS L. DAY); Filed by REZA SADEGHI (Defendant); JANET SADEGHI (Defendant); Fausto Duran Erroneously Sued As DURAN FAUSTO (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketReply (Reply Brief and Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Terminating Sanctions and for Monetary Sanctions in the Amount of $4,621.50 Against Defendants and Their Counsel, Douglas L. Day, Esq.); Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketMotion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (against Judge: Susan Bryant-Deason); Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHIU SYLVIA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORALYAN EMMA