This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2023 at 00:09:44 (UTC).

LILIA GARCIA-BROWER, CALIFORNIA LABOR COMMISSIONER, DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIO VS KREATION JUICERY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 LILIA GARCIA-BROWER, CALIFORNIA LABOR COMMISSIONER, DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against KREATION JUICERY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5395

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LILIA GARCIA-BROWER CALIFORNIA LABOR COMMISSIONER DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON BEHALF OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

TO 10 DOES 1

KREATION JUICERY INC.

SARSHAR MARJAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORRES-MORALES ADALBERTO

Defendant Attorney

BARBER JOHN L

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/9/2021: Complaint

Request for Dismissal

7/27/2023: Request for Dismissal

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

3/30/2023: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

3/29/2023: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)

1/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/4/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

10/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/4/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/8/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/8/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

10/12/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/12/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/13/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/13/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (Conditional - Filed 03/29/2023) scheduled for 08/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Conditional Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Lilia Garcia-Brower, California Labor Commissioner, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, Department of Industrial Relatio on 11/23/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Lilia Garcia-Brower, California Labor Commissioner, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, Department of Industrial Relations, State of California, on behalf of the People of the State of California as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Lilia Garcia-Brower, California Labor Commissioner, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, Department of Industrial Relations, State of California, on behalf of the People of the State of California (Plaintiff); As to: Kreation Juicery, Inc. (Defendant); Marjan Sarshar (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement (Conditional): Name Extension: (Conditional) ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/10/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Settlement scheduled for 04/10/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketAddress for Adalberto Corres-Morales (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Kreation Juicery, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Kreation Juicery, Inc., a California Corporation to Kreation Juicery, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Marjan Sarshar (Defendant): Last Name changed from Sarshar, an individual to Sarshar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kristin S. Escalante in Department 24 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lilia Garcia-Brower, California Labor Commissioner, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, Department of Industrial Relations, State of California, on behalf of the People of the State of California (Plaintiff); As to: Kreation Juicery, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Marjan Sarshar, an individual (Defendant); DOES 1 to 10 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lilia Garcia-Brower, California Labor Commissioner, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, Department of Industrial Relations, State of California, on behalf of the People of the State of California (Plaintiff); As to: Kreation Juicery, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Marjan Sarshar, an individual (Defendant); DOES 1 to 10 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lilia Garcia-Brower, California Labor Commissioner, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, Department of Industrial Relations, State of California, on behalf of the People of the State of California (Plaintiff); As to: Kreation Juicery, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Marjan Sarshar, an individual (Defendant); DOES 1 to 10 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less