This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 04:15:39 (UTC).

LILIA CHAIREZ VS ALVIN KORNELIUS BANMAN

Case Summary

On 04/05/2018 LILIA CHAIREZ filed an Other lawsuit against ALVIN KORNELIUS BANMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0946

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CHAIREZ LILIA

Defendants and Respondents

BANMAN ALVIN KORNELIUS

DOES 1 TO 20

ESTATE OF ALVIN KORNELIUS BANMAN DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KHAKSHOOY BOB B. ESQ.

AGARWAL SANDEEP GOPAL

Defendant Attorney

PASAROW STEPHEN CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

1/11/2021: Notice of Ruling

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

1/11/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS...)

1/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS...)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

1/11/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULED HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED ...) OF 12/17/2020

12/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULED HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED ...) OF 12/17/2020

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

8/3/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

8/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF SUSPENSION

4/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF SUSPENSION

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN-FIRM

4/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN-FIRM

Proof of Service by Mail

4/27/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020

4/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

12/23/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/26/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES PRAYER FROM COMPLAINT

11/26/2019: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES PRAYER FROM COMPLAINT

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/15/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

SUMMONS -

4/5/2018: SUMMONS -

PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

4/5/2018: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • Hearing06/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Hearing03/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Sandeep Gopal Agarwal (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Sandeep Gopal Agarwal (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Lilia Chairez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Estate of Alvin Kornelius Banman, Deceased Erroneously Sued As Alvin Kornelius Banman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Estate of Alvin Kornelius Banman, Deceased Erroneously Sued As Alvin Kornelius Banman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (Stipulation to Strike Punitive Damages Prayer from Complaint); Filed by Estate of Alvin Kornelius Banman, Deceased Erroneously Sued As Alvin Kornelius Banman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Lilia Chairez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lilia Chairez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC700946    Hearing Date: January 11, 2021    Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

LILIA CHAIREZ,

Plaintiff,

vs.

ALVIN KORNELIUS BANMAN,

Defendant.

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

BC700946

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED

Dept. 27

8:30 a.m.

January 11, 2021

The Law Offices of Bob Khakshooy and Sandeep G. Agarwal seek to be relieved as counsel of record for Plaintiff Lilia Chairez on grounds that Counsel has been unable to communicate or locate Plaintiff despite making diligent effortsAbsent a showing of resulting prejudice, an attorney’s request for withdrawal should be granted.  (People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398, 406.)  

This Motion was originally scheduled to be heard on December 23, 2020.  On December 17, 2020, the Court issued a Minute Order rescheduling the hearing on this Motion for January 11, 2021 and ordered Moving party to give notice.  No amended notice of hearing is on file and there is no indication that Plaintiff or parties that have appeared in the action have been served with notice of this new hearing date.  Accordingly, Counsel’s Motion to be relieved is DENIED without prejudice. 

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  

11th day of January 2021

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr. 

Judge of the Superior Court