This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/02/2021 at 21:31:02 (UTC).

LILI FARMS, INC. VS WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 LILI FARMS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0648

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LILI FARMS INC.

Defendants

PURCELL JAMIE

WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEUTZIUS WILLIAM J.

Defendant Attorney

TAORMINA COSMO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/17/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/16/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

12/28/2020: Answer

Answer

12/28/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

2/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/12/2021

3/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/12/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • Hearing12/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Hearing12/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Hearing12/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 03/12/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by Lili Farms, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by West Central Produce, Inc. (Defendant); Jamie Purcell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jamie Purcell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lili Farms, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lili Farms, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lili Farms, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lili Farms, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lili Farms, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEUTZIUS WILLIAM J.